Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4134 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17540 Week
» 70556 Month
» 190083 Year
» 3216936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3140 |
01/03/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86046 |
02/1974 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86258 |
20/05/1975 |
TOPS (86/5a) |
86501 |
20/05/1988 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86258 |
01/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
01/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
07/2002 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
Cut Up |
01/12/2009 |
Cut At |
EMR Kingsbury |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
01/03/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
01/03/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3140 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86046 |
|
|
20/05/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86258 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
20/05/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86501 |
|
|
01/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86258 |
|
|
07/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86258 |
|
|
01/12/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|