Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4632 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20244 Week
» 118889 Month
» 321553 Year
» 3348406 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3839 |
y/e |
1917 |
British Railways |
43839 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1917 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/03/1960 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1917 |
17A |
|
Derby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
17B |
|
Burton |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1917 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3839 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43839 |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43839 |
|
|
12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|