Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1029 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19940 Week
» 84894 Month
» 287558 Year
» 3314411 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3842 |
y/e |
1917 |
British Railways |
43842 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1917 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/11/1959 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1917 |
9D |
|
Buxton (LNWR) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1917 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3842 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43842 |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43842 |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|