Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 621 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18424 Week
» 71440 Month
» 190967 Year
» 3217820 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3859 |
y/e |
1918 |
British Railways |
43859 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1962 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1946 |
Belle Vue MPD |
The following interesting visitors were noted during January: 2829 (21A); 3319 (16B); 3982 (15A); 3615 (4A); 4853 (20A), 5298 (8A); 12861 (23B). During February: 3231 (20G); 3335 (20G); 3454 (15D); 3620 (21A); 3859 (16B); 4045 (22B); 4186 (21A); 4292 (11E). On 9/2 6132 (20A) passed through on an express travelling in the direction of Manchester Victoria. |
SLS/194604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1918 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3859 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43859 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43859 |
|
|