Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1903 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15309 Week
» 68325 Month
» 187852 Year
» 3214705 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3872 |
y/e |
1918 |
British Railways |
43872 |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/08/1961 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1918 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3872 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Coalville (17C) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43872 |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43872 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|