Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1046 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14452 Week
» 67468 Month
» 186995 Year
» 3213848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3875 |
y/e |
1918 |
British Railways |
43875 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/05/1956 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 26/05/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1918 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3875 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43875 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
05/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43875 |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|