Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3508 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16914 Week
» 69930 Month
» 189457 Year
» 3216310 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3890 |
y/e |
1919 |
British Railways |
43890 |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1919 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/02/1959 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1919 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3890 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hasland (18C) |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H) |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43890 |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43890 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|