Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20096 Week
» 73112 Month
» 192639 Year
» 3219492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3894 |
y/e |
1919 |
British Railways |
43894 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1919 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 03/09/1955 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 08/10/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17C |
Coalville |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1919 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3894 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43894 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (17C) |
|
|
03/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43894 |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|