Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1073 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18876 Week
» 71892 Month
» 191419 Year
» 3218272 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3927 |
y/e |
1920 |
British Railways |
43927 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1920 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/10/1957 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1920 |
19E |
|
Belle Vue |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
39A |
|
Gorton |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/10/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1920 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3927 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43927 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
26/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43927 |
|
|
11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|