07/03/1951 |
Derby Works |
Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3, 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. |
SLS/195108 |
14/03/1951 |
Derby Works |
Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3: 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. |
SLS/195104 |
03/07/1958 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. |
SLS/195807 |
14/04/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 2 bay) |
Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. |
SLS/195905 |
15/05/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. |
SLS/196106 |
14/06/1961 |
Derby MPD (Ex Works on Shed) |
Ex Works on Shed: D2910, 42517, 43991, 44124, 47288, 48643, 73033, 73127/32, 75011. |
SLS/196107 |