Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1561 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19364 Week
» 72380 Month
» 191907 Year
» 3218760 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4026 |
y/e |
1922 |
British Railways |
44026 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/07/1963 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
19/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
5w/e |
03/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
01/04/1961 |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
18C |
Hasland |
5w/e |
04/05/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1922 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4026 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44026 |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
01/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44026 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|