Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4868 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18911 Week
» 83865 Month
» 286529 Year
» 3313382 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
765 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
British Railways |
30765 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 765, name: SIR GARETH Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30765 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
12/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30765 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|