|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/10/1951 | Eastleigh Works | In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). | SLS/195112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1925 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 773, name: SIR LAVAINE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30773 | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
08/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
16/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) | ||
13/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) | ||
01/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30773 | ||
04/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |