30/06/1942 |
S.R. Class Z and the W.D. |
S.R. Class Z 0-8-0Ts 951/56 were loaned to the W. D. during period 2/42 and may not have reached Scotland until April. These would be the locos. seen on 26/9/42 as 955 was not loaned until period 10/42. They were allotted W. D. numbers 213/5 in numerical order but I do not think these numbers were ever carried. They returned to S.R. stock at the end of 1943. |
SLS/198706 |
25/01/1952 |
Nine Elms Goods shed |
30955 was missing from Nine Elms Goods Yard in mid-January, but reappeared on 25/1/52 for two days only. During that week no steam locomotives were noted on shunting duties, which were being performed by four diesels, one of which was 15235. |
SLS/195204 |
18/02/1962 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. |
SLS/196204 |
25/02/1962 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. |
SLS/196204 |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (awaiting scrap) |
Eastleigh shed contained the following locomotives awaiting scrap: 4656, 30033/45/65/70, 30199/225/494/502/17, 30690, 30770, 30917/26/9/37, 30955, 31892, 32346/9/50/1, 32408. |
SLS/196303 |