Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 36 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 854 Week
» 17805 Month
» 170758 Year
» 1836134 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1004 m/e 07/1901
British Railways 31004 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1901
RAM   Ramsgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73H   Dover Marine 6w/e 09/02/1960
73F   Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1004
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31004    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
11/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
11/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31004    

prev