Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 565 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4247 Week
» 10955 Month
» 163908 Year
» 1829284 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1005 m/e 05/1907
British Railways 31005 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sun 15/09/1963
Service Life 56 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1907
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 6w/e 21/06/1955
75C   Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
75A   Brighton 4w/e 24/11/1960
75F   Tunbridge Wells West m/e 10/02/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1963
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74A Ashford 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1963
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/02/1960 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/12/1948 Ashford Works Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1005
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31005    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
09/02/1960 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
15/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31005    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
05/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev