Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 564 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4246 Week
» 10954 Month
» 163907 Year
» 1829283 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1027 m/e 02/1910
British Railways 31027 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class P
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/03/1961
Service Life 51 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1910
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 19/03/1952
71D   Fratton 9w/e 30/06/1952
74C   Dover Marine 8w/e 20/07/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 25/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 21/01/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 19/03/1952
TOSTORE 71D Fratton m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 74A Ashford 9w/e 11/12/1952
REINS 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 20/07/1953
WDN   w/e 25/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1910 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1027
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31027    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
25/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31027    

prev