Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 535 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4217 Week
» 10925 Month
» 163878 Year
» 1829254 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1033 m/e 10/1900
British Railways 31033 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/03/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1900
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73G     4w/e 12/05/1951
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70B   Feltham 5w/e 18/07/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 18/07/1959
WDN   w/e 19/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1033
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31033    
12/05/1951 Allocation      
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
03/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    
19/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31033    

prev prev