Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 540 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4222 Week
» 10930 Month
» 163883 Year
» 1829259 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1036 m/e 12/1908
British Railways 31036 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class E
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/03/1951
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1908
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 10/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 10/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
16/03/1951 Brighton Works New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1036
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31036    
03/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
10/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31036    

prev