Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 586 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4268 Week
» 10976 Month
» 163929 Year
» 1829305 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1037 m/e 03/1901
British Railways 31037 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/02/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1901
STL   St Leonards on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 5w/e 11/12/1952
74A   Ashford 4w/e 08/02/1954
73A   Stewarts Lane 9w/e 12/06/1957
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 08/10/1957
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70C   Guildford 5w/e 18/07/1959
70C   Guildford 4w/e 05/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 25/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 9w/e 11/12/1952
ALLOC 74A Ashford 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 73C Hither Green q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 18/07/1959
WDN   w/e 25/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1037
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31037    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
25/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31037    
03/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev