Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 532 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4214 Week
» 10922 Month
» 163875 Year
» 1829251 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1047 m/e 08/1895
British Railways 31047 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1895
Withdrawal During 03/1960
Service Life 64 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1895
FOL   Folkestone Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
74C   Dover Marine 7w/e 27/06/1951
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FOLK   8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 02/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1895 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1047
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Folkestone Junction (FOL)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31047    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31047    
04/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev