Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 46 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 864 Week
» 17815 Month
» 170768 Year
» 1836144 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1054 m/e 03/1901
British Railways 31054 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/08/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1901
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B   Ramsgate 5w/e 14/02/1953
73C   Hither Green 6w/e 27/03/1953
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70C   Guildford 5w/e 18/07/1959
70C   Guildford 4w/e 05/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 20/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 20/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1054
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31054    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
20/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31054    
10/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev