Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 539 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4221 Week
» 10929 Month
» 163882 Year
» 1829258 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1057 m/e 06/1902
British Railways 31057 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class Coppernobs
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/04/1951
Service Life 48 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1902
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 9w/e 01/08/1948
RDG   Reading (S.R.) 6w/e 26/09/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 07/04/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC RDG Reading (S.R.) 6w/e 26/09/1949
WDN   w/e 07/04/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1057
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31057    
26/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
04/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
07/04/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31057    

prev