Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 47 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 17816 Month
» 170769 Year
» 1836145 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1069 m/e 06/1898
British Railways 31069 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/06/1958
Service Life 60 yrs , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1898
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C   Dover Marine 9w/e 30/06/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 07/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74CFOLK   m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 74CFOLK   9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 74CFOL   w/e 13/06/1955
WDN   w/e 07/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1898 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1069
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31069    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
06/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    
07/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 31069    

prev prev