Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 44 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2842 Week
» 14524 Month
» 167477 Year
» 1832853 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1090 m/e 01/1903
British Railways 31090 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/08/1953
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1953

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1903
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GFD   Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 08/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
WDN   w/e 08/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704
14/05/1948 General Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1903 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1090
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31090    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 31090    
10/1953 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev