Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 534 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4216 Week
» 10924 Month
» 163877 Year
» 1829253 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1113 m/e 03/1902
British Railways 31113 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/07/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1902
HIT   Hither Green on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C   Dover Marine 7w/e 22/04/1950
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 15/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 15/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1113
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31113    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
15/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31113    
08/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev