Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 562 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4244 Week
» 10952 Month
» 163905 Year
» 1829281 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1128 m/e 10/1892
British Railways 31128 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class R1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/08/1959
Service Life 66 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1892
FOL   Folkestone Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 08/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 08/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1892 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1128
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Folkestone Junction (FOL)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31128    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31128    
01/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev