Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 849 Week
» 17800 Month
» 170753 Year
» 1836129 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1158 m/e 12/1909
British Railways 31158 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/04/1955
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1909
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75F   Tunbridge Wells West m/e 30/11/1950
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 08/12/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
74E   St Leonards 4w/e 29/10/1953
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 10/12/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 16/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 6w/e 18/11/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 10w/e 10/12/1953
WDN   w/e 16/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1950 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704
30/06/1950 General Three I.1X locomotives have recently been transferred from Bognor to New Cross Gate, namely 2002, 2008, 2596.
'H' tanks Nos. 1158 an 1319 are being fitted for pull-and-push working.
'D.3' 32365, of air attack fame, originally Victoria, has been repaired at Ashford.
Several 'B.4X' ex store were working at the end of June, in readiness for use if required on Farnborough Air Pageant Specials; for these the E.R. (G.E. Section) lent a number of Westinghouse-fitted trains as traffic was expected to be heavy.
SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1158
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
08/1950 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31158    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
29/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
16/04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31158    

prev prev