Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 571 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4253 Week
» 10961 Month
» 163914 Year
» 1829290 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1161 m/e 06/1909
British Railways 31161 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1909
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 14/02/1953
74E   St Leonards 8w/e 20/07/1953
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 20/08/1954
75E   Three Bridges 6w/e 14/06/1959
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 10/06/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) P 20/08/1954
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 10/06/1960
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1161
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31161    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
10/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
11/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31161    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev