Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 548 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4230 Week
» 10938 Month
» 163891 Year
» 1829267 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1162 m/e 03/1909
British Railways 31162 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1909
Withdrawal During 07/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1909
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E   Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951
74E   St Leonards 5w/e 14/02/1953
75F   Tunbridge Wells West q/e 06/06/1958
75E   Three Bridges 3w/e 13/10/1958
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 26/11/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West P 26/11/1959
WDN   w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1162
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31162    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
03/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
03/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31162    

prev prev