Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1163 m/e 04/1909
British Railways 31163 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class E1A
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1909
Withdrawal During 05/1949
Service Life 40 yrs , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1909
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/08/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 01/08/1948
WDN   4w/e 01/06/1949
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1163
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 31163 but not taken up    
1949 Scrapped Scrapped    
05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1163    

prev prev