Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 561 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4243 Week
» 10951 Month
» 163904 Year
» 1829280 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1164 m/e 02/1909
British Railways 31164 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/10/1959
Service Life 50 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1909
RAM   Ramsgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 6w/e 26/09/1949
74E   St Leonards 4w/e 13/11/1950
74E   St Leonards 3w/e 30/11/1950
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 06/10/1951
74D   Tonbridge 5w/e 08/10/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 24/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 6w/e 26/09/1949
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 5w/e 08/10/1951
WDN   w/e 24/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708
31/07/1949 \"H\" Class 0-4-4T\'s Five 'H' Class 0-4-4T's, Nos. 31016, 1164, 21182, 31520 an 1523, have been fitted for pull-and-push working, to replace the 'D.3' 0-4-4T's now being withdrawn. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1164
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31164    
26/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
10/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
24/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31164    

prev prev