Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1175 m/e 08/1908
British Railways 31175 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class E
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal During 10/1951
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1908
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1948
TOSTORE BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 13/11/1948
WDN   on 29/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/09/1951 Ashford Works Diesel-electric 10202 away to Nine Elms for working to West of England; Diesel 15230 being painted, 15231 almost ready. 31176 cut up 18th September, (3)1175 to be done later in the same week. 31596 (the only surviving class J 0-6-4T) cleaned and touched up for official photograph. SLS/195110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1175
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
06/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 31175 but not taken up    
1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 1175    

prev prev