Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 546 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4228 Week
» 10936 Month
» 163889 Year
» 1829265 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1176 m/e 12/1907
British Railways 31176 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class E
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal During 10/1951
Service Life 43 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1907
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STL St Leonards m/e 31/03/1946
TOSTORE NX New Cross Gate 9w/e 01/06/1948
WDN   on 08/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/09/1951 Ashford Works Diesel-electric 10202 away to Nine Elms for working to West of England; Diesel 15230 being painted, 15231 almost ready. 31176 cut up 18th September, (3)1175 to be done later in the same week. 31596 (the only surviving class J 0-6-4T) cleaned and touched up for official photograph. SLS/195110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1176
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31176    
1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 31176    

prev prev