Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 586 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4268 Week
» 10976 Month
» 163929 Year
» 1829305 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1177 m/e 03/1909
British Railways 31177 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1909
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1909
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 11/04/1951
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 13/04/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 13/04/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1909 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1177
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31177    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31177    

prev prev