Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 577 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 10967 Month
» 163920 Year
» 1829296 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1221 m/e 03/1901
British Railways 31221 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/08/1959
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1901
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GFD   Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/02/1954
74A   Ashford 4w/e 06/11/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 15/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 74A Ashford 9w/e 31/10/1954
WDN   w/e 15/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/05/1948 General Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1221
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31221    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
08/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
15/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31221    

prev prev