Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 572 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4254 Week
» 10962 Month
» 163915 Year
» 1829291 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1223 m/e 03/1901
British Railways 31223 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/05/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1901
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 08/02/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 14/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 6w/e 08/02/1954
WDN   w/e 14/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1223
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31223    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
05/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    
14/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31223    

prev prev