Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 547 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4229 Week
» 10937 Month
» 163890 Year
» 1829266 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1225 m/e 12/1900
British Railways 31225 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/06/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1900
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GFD   Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 06/10/1951
73C   Hither Green 5w/e 08/10/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/02/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 04/06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 08/02/1954
WDN   w/e 04/06/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/05/1948 General Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. SLS/194806
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1225
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (GFD)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31225    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
04/06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31225    

prev prev