Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 48 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2846 Week
» 14528 Month
» 167481 Year
» 1832857 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1229 m/e 01/1900
British Railways 31229 m/e 02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1900
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 61 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1900
FAV   Faversham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73A   Stewarts Lane 6w/e 09/02/1960
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/07/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 04/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1229
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 31229    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31229    
11/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev