Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 45 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 863 Week
» 17814 Month
» 170767 Year
» 1836143 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1234 m/e 04/1901
British Railways 31234 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/08/1953
Service Life 52 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1953

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1901
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 5w/e 04/02/1950
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 08/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 04/02/1950
WDN   w/e 08/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1901 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1234
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31234    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
1953 Scrapped Scrapped    
08/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 31234    

prev prev