Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 573 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4255 Week
» 10963 Month
» 163916 Year
» 1829292 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1246 m/e 06/1902
British Railways 31246 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class D1
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/03/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1902
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/08/1948
TON   Tonbridge 5w/e 12/02/1949
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 10/10/1955
74A   Ashford 3w/e 17/11/1956
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 11/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine m/e 30/06/1947
TOSTORE DOV Dover Marine 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 5w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 74A Ashford P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 11/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1902 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1246
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31246    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
11/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31246    
05/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev