Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 37 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 855 Week
» 17806 Month
» 170759 Year
» 1836135 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1255 m/e 06/1900
British Railways 31255 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/09/1961
Service Life 61 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1900
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) on 24/06/1950
73E   Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951
73F   Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 30/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) on 24/06/1950
LOAN 73E Faversham on 12/05/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 73F Ashford P 14/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1900 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1255
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31255    
24/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
30/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31255    

prev prev