Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 559 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4241 Week
» 10949 Month
» 163902 Year
» 1829278 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1259 m/e 11/1905
British Railways 31259 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Service Life 54 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1905
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RAM   Ramsgate 9w/e 01/03/1948
73E   Faversham m/e 30/11/1950
73E   Faversham 4w/e 08/12/1950
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 01/03/1948
ALLOC 73E Faversham m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   on 05/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1259
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
01/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (RAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31259    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31259    
01/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev