Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1263 m/e 05/1905
British Railways 31263 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 58 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1905
BAT   Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955
74A   Ashford 6w/e 15/06/1956
73J   Tonbridge 4w/e 05/04/1960
73F   Ashford 4w/e 01/02/1962
75E   Three Bridges 5w/e 02/07/1962
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 75B Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 05/04/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 4w/e 01/02/1962
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/04/1960 Push and Pull Fitted

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1263
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31263    
09/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
05/04/1960 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
01/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31263    

prev prev