Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1265 m/e 05/1905
British Railways 31265 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/08/1960
Service Life 55 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1905
RAM   Ramsgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 06/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate m/e 30/11/1946
TOSTORE 74B Ramsgate m/e 31/08/1950
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
WDN   w/e 06/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1265
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31265    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
06/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31265    
09/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev