Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 589 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4271 Week
» 10979 Month
» 163932 Year
» 1829308 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1267 m/e 01/1904
British Railways 31267 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/06/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1904
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E   Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/02/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 30/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   w/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1267
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31267    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
30/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31267    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev