Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2839 Week
» 14521 Month
» 167474 Year
» 1832850 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1268 m/e 02/1904
British Railways 31268 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/05/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1904
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
FAV   Faversham 5w/e 04/02/1950
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73C   Hither Green 6w/e 09/02/1960
73F   Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FAV Faversham 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 05/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1268
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31268    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (FAV)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
05/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    
05/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31268    

prev prev