Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 38 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2836 Week
» 14518 Month
» 167471 Year
» 1832847 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1269 m/e 11/1905
British Railways 31269 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal Sat 12/12/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1905
AFD   Ashford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
74E   St Leonards 4w/e 29/10/1953
75F   Tunbridge Wells West q/e 06/06/1958
75E   Three Bridges 3w/e 13/10/1958
75A   Brighton 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn on 12/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 6w/e 18/11/1953
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 14/06/1959
WDN   on 12/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/10/1953 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1269
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31269    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
29/10/1953 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
29/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
12/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
12/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31269    

prev prev