Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 560 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4242 Week
» 10950 Month
» 163903 Year
» 1829279 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1278 m/e 07/1905
British Railways 31278 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/10/1962
Service Life 57 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1905
GIL   Gillingham (Kent) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 26/05/1953
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 20/04/1956
     Withdrawn w/e 06/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 26/05/1953
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 74C Dover Marine w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 9w/e 10/04/1956
WDN   w/e 06/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1905 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1278
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31278    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
20/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
06/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31278    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev