Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 583 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4265 Week
» 10973 Month
» 163926 Year
» 1829302 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1280 m/e 02/1908
British Railways 31280 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1908
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 55 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1908
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 6w/e 01/04/1957
75C   Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
75A   Brighton 4w/e 24/11/1960
75A   Brighton 7w/e 23/08/1961
73F   Ashford m/e 08/12/1961
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 9w/e 01/04/1957
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 4w/e 08/12/1961
LOAN DEPT   on 17/06/1962
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1908 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1280
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31280    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31280    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev